OR HB3409 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Chapter 290, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Chapter 290, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "natural hair care." Specifies that person who is certified to practice hair design or barbering is authorized to practice natural hair care.
Title
Relating to natural hair care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | House | Chapter 290, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2013. |
2013-06-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Freeman, Krieger; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Hoyle. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed. Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer, Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2013-04-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency. |
2013-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |