OR HB3401 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 751, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 751, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows school district boards of school districts located in specified regions to request distribution of percentage of moneys available to education service district from State School Fund and local revenues.
Title
Relating to education service districts; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 751, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Baertschiger, Ferrioli, Girod, Whitsett. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Bentz, Davis, McLane, Parrish, Whitsett; Excused, 3--Bailey, Hicks, Weidner. |
2013-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-25 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-16 | House | Subsequent referral to Revenue rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2013-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, subsequent referral to Revenue be rescinded, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2013-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |