OR HB3396 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 829, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Policy Board to study and evaluate effectiveness of existing financial incentive programs offered in this state and address new types of programs to recruit and retain health care providers to practice in rural and medically underserved areas. Requires board to report its findings to Legislative Assembly and make recommendations with respect to continuing or restructuring programs or replacing programs with new programs. Sunsets various financial incentive programs on January 2, 2018. Requires that participants in programs that sunset be allowed to complete term of service agreement or commitment. Extends sunset on rural medical provider tax credit for two years to January 1, 2018. Modifies criteria related to tax credit for rural medical provider. Creates Health Care Provider Incentive Fund. Declares emergency, effective on passage.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health care provider incentive programs; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 46 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 829, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-13SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-06HouseRules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 46; Nays, 11--Barreto, Davis, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Krieger, Post, Stark, Weidner, Wilson; Excused, 2--Buehler, Gallegos; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Clem.
2015-07-06SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters, Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Knopp, Thomsen; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-06SenateSecond reading.
2015-07-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.)
2015-07-03SenateWork Session held.
2015-07-03SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2015-07-03SenateWork Session held.
2015-07-03SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2015-07-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-07-01HouseThird reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 41; Nays, 19--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Olson, Post, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson.
2015-06-30HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2015-06-29HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-25HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-25HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-23HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-06-17HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2015-04-23HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2015-04-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2015-04-17HouseWork Session held.
2015-03-30HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-06HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2015-02-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3396
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3396/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3396/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3396/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3396/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3396/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3396/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3396/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3396/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21823
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23289
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363632
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23457
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=365033
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=365099

Bill Comments

feedback