OR HB3371 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for regulation of production, processing and sale of marijuana and marijuana-infused products.
Title
Relating to the Control, Regulation and Taxation of Cannabis Act; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-04-08 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-04-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |