OR HB3367 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Lost Revenue Stabilization Fund and School Stabilization Fund. Requires local governments to unconditionally allow restoration or replacement of certain uses destroyed by 2020 wildfires until December 31, 2025.] Establishes Lost Revenue Stabilization Fund and School Stabilization Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in funds for recovery from 2020 wildfires. Sunsets January 2, 2026] June 30, 2027. Declares emergency, effective on passage] July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to 2020 wildfires; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Lily Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-06-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-05-28 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-03-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |