OR HB3365 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 450, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 450, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes process for forming or dissolving livestock district, annexing land to livestock district or withdrawing land from livestock district.
Title
Relating to livestock districts.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 450, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Marsh; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Baertschiger Jr; Excused, 2--Hansell, Johnson. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Fahey, Salinas; Excused, 2--Barreto, McLane. |
2019-04-11 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |