OR HB3363 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits school district from allowing certain promotional activities for food or beverage items that do not meet minimum nutritional standards. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to school nutritional standards; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to Education. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3363 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3363/Introduced |