OR HB3289 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 147, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 147, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to conduct studies on local and regional correctional facility data collection and provision of health care. Directs Department of Corrections] Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to conduct study] studies on local and regional correctional facility siting process and] data collection and provision of health care. Directs commission to convene advisory council for studies. Directs local and regional correctional facilities to submit data for studies no later than January 1, 2020. Directs commission to present report on findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary on or before September 15, 2020. Sunsets January 2, 2021. Repeals statutes requiring sheriff to house federal prisoners in local correctional facility at expense of United States. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to correctional facilities; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Chapter 147, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Carried over to 05-15 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Nearman, Wallan; Excused, 1--Marsh; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Nathanson, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-04-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |