OR HB3288 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 435, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 435, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each public university to submit to Higher Education Coordinating Commission report identifying causes of increases in administrative positions and other cost drivers at university. Requires each public university to submit to Higher Education Coordinating Commission report identifying causes of increases in administrative positions and other cost drivers at university. Requires commission to compile reports and submit compiled report to Joint Committee on Ways and Means as part of commission's budget presentation during each regular session of Legislative Assembly held during odd-numbered year.
Title
Relating to noninstructional professional positions at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Chapter 435, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 53; Excused, 7--Bentz, Boone, Helm, McLane, Noble, Smith G, Witt. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 6--Barker, Bynum, Heard, Kennemer, McLain, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-25 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |