OR HB3286 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Chapter 246, (2011 Laws): Effective date June 7, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Chapter 246, (2011 Laws): Effective date June 7, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Department of Corrections fees for service of documents; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to Department of Corrections fees for service of documents; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Chapter 246, (2011 Laws): Effective date June 7, 2011. | |
2011-06-07 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-02 | President signed. | |
2011-06-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-23 | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 21; nays, 9--Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Morse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett. | |
2011-05-19 | Carried over to 05-23 by unanimous consent. | |
2011-05-18 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-18 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-05-16 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-10 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-04-27 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-26 | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Freeman, Thatcher, Wingard; Excused, 1--Nolan. | |
2011-04-25 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-21 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-04-18 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-01 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-02-16 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |