OR HB3271 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates income tax credit for employers that pay employees wages greater than minimum wage. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2016, and before January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a tax credit for employers that pay wages greater than minimum wage; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3271 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3271/Introduced |