OR HB3258 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 692, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 692, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes office of State Chief Information Officer in Oregon Department of Administrative Services for purpose of directing, coordinating and overseeing policy related to information technology.
Title
Relating to state information technology resources; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Harker [D] | Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] |
Rep. Jessica Pederson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-29 | House | Chapter 692, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013. |
2013-07-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 21; nays, 8--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Olsen; excused, 1--Thomsen. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Harker. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 10--Cameron, Freeman, Gilliam, Kennemer, Olson, Parrish, Sprenger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Hanna, Unger. |
2013-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-30 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |