OR HB3254 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 304, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands definition of term "eligible residential treatment program" for purpose of determining which programs Department of Education will provide payment for costs of education of students in program. Directs Department of Education to provide moneys for payment of costs of education of students in qualified treatment programs.] Expands definition of term "eligible residential treatment program" for purpose of determining which programs Department of Education will provide payment for costs of education of students in program. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the education of students in treatment programs; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseChapter 304, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2021.
2021-06-15HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-08SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Wright.
2021-06-02SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Heard.
2021-06-01SenateSecond reading.
2021-05-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2021-05-17SenateWork Session held.
2021-05-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Education.
2021-04-19SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-15HouseThird reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Levy; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2021-04-14HouseCarried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-13HouseCarried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseSecond reading.
2021-04-01HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2021-04-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2021-03-30HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-26HouseReferred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-02-23HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3254
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3254/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3254/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3254/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3254/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3254/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3254/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31654
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=516045
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32454
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=526713
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=527147

Bill Comments 750

feedback