OR HB3253 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Chapter 437, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 18, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Chapter 437, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 18, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires sex offender who is released into Oregon, who is placed on probation in Oregon or who moves into Oregon, to register as sex offender if jurisdiction of conviction or federal law requires registration, regardless of whether conviction would be sex crime in this state.
Title
Relating to sex offender registration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Chapter 437, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 18, 2013. |
2013-06-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Esquivel, Hanna; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Buckley, Jenson, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Jenson, Sprenger. |
2013-04-11 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |