OR HB3227 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 165, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 165, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Department of Consumer and Business Services from outlawing in state building code certain uses of specific refrigerants authorized under federal law. Directs Housing and Community Services Department to study issues relating to adequacy of buildings in this state and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022.] Sunsets January 2, 2023.] Prohibits Department of Consumer and Business Services from outlawing in state building code certain uses of specific refrigerants authorized under federal law.
Title
Relating to buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 165, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Hudson, Leif, Nearman, Noble. |
2021-04-20 | House | Carried over to April 26, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |