OR HB3227 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Allows person that uses natural gas or propane in motor vehicle to pay annual special use fuel license fee in lieu of per-gallon tax.
Title
Relating to taxation of use fuels; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |