OR HB3217 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands definition of abuse of individuals with mental illness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to abuse of individuals with mental illness; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-08HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2013-03-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-03-01HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2013-02-22HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback