OR HB3216 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 403, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 403, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Chief Education Office to conduct study for purpose of identifying practices that assist students in poverty families. Directs office to submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to education no later than September 15, 2018. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to students in poverty families; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 403, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Lininger, McKeown. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Education. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |