OR HB3214 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Mar 30 @ 8:00 am in HR D
Hearing: Apr 3 @ 8:00 am in HR D
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Mar 30 @ 8:00 am in HR D
Hearing: Apr 3 @ 8:00 am in HR D
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person from using specified types of animals in traveling animal act. Prohibits person from using specified types of animals in traveling animal act. Provides certain exemptions from prohibition. Punishes by maximum of six months' imprisonment, $2,500 fine, or both. Authorizes court to require person convicted of violation to forfeit animal used in violation.
Title
Relating to traveling animal acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary by order of Speaker. |
2023-03-02 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Small Business. |
2023-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |