OR HB3210 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that Department of Revenue transfer moneys from Oregon Marijuana Account to Drug Treatment and Recovery Services Fund after completion of transfers from account to cities and counties. Requires that Department of Revenue transfer moneys from Oregon Marijuana Account to Drug Treatment and Recovery Services Fund after completion of transfers from account to cities and counties. Applies to fiscal quarters beginning on or after April 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the disposition of marijuana tax revenues; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3210 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3210/Introduced |