OR HB3192 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes annual assessment on manufacture of prescription opioids. Applies to opioids dispensed on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to assessment imposed on manufacture of prescription opioids; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, refer to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-26 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |