OR HB3191 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to administer pilot program to offer summer education to elementary school students in high poverty, low performing schools with high populations of English language learners. Sunsets pilot program on January 2, 2020. Establishes Summer Learning Fund, separate and distinct from General Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in Summer Learning Fund to State Library for purposes of funding summer learning planning, programming and awareness. Appropriates moneys from General Fund for deposit in Summer Learning Fund. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to summer education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |