OR HB3174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to develop and implement one or more pilot programs statewide to provide training, job placement services, financial assistance, technical support and business creation assistance to veterans in construction and construction materials industries. Permits moneys in Veterans' Services Fund established pursuant to constitutional provision to develop, implement and maintain pilot programs. Requires report to Legislative Assembly regarding status of pilot programs by September 15, 2018. Sunsets pilot programs on December 31, 2019. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to workforce assistance to veterans in construction industry; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] |
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-03-30 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |