OR HB3173 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that when two or more county commissioners are elected for one county at same election and one is elected to fill vacancy, commissioner filling vacancy shall hold office for two years. Applies this rule, which currently applies only to general elections, to primary elections. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to elections for county commissioners; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] |
Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Leif. Passed. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Evans. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |