OR HB3166 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies cost recovery formula for site certificate holders. Transfers duties, functions and powers of State Department of Energy related to issuance of loans for small scale local energy projects to Oregon Business Development Department. Becomes operative on July 1, 2018. Requires Oregon Business Development Department to study commercial needs in state for loans for small scale local energy projects. Requires Oregon Business Development Department to initially complete study no later than September 15, 2018. Requires loan contracts to make loans payable in full in event that Director of Oregon Business Development Department declares default of payment of loan or project that is subject of loan fails to meet standards and criteria for projects. Becomes operative on July 1, 2018. Abolishes Energy Project Supplemental Fund, Energy Revenue Bond Repayment Fund, Energy Project Bond Loan Fund and Jobs, Energy and School Fund. Transfers moneys remaining in abolished funds to Small Scale Local Energy Project Administration and Bond Sinking Fund. Repeals energy efficiency and sustainable technology loan program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the State Department of Energy; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 24--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-28 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |