OR HB3147 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 173, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 173, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Fish and Wildlife Director to, before appointing Oregon Hatchery Research Center Board members, consult with organizations that represent certain interests and take into consideration nominations or recommendations received in course of consultation.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Hatchery Research Center.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] |
Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 173, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Boone, Gorsek, Lininger, McKeown, Piluso. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |