OR HB3144 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases, for purposes of tax credit allowed for crop donation, percentage of wholesale price allowed as amount of credit. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2015. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits for crop donation; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] |
Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] |
Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2015-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3144 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3144/Introduced |