OR HB3135 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Teacher Standards and Practices Commission to require applicant for first-time license or registration as teacher, or applicant for renewal of license or registration as teacher, to provide evidence of current certification in cardiopulmonary resuscitation.
Title
Relating to student safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |