OR HB3133 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to sobriety checkpoints; prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to sobriety checkpoints; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. Dave Hunt [D] | Rep. Mark Johnson [R] |
Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] | Rep. Sherrie Sprenger [R] | Rep. Jim Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-03-24 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-02-07 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/hb3100.dir/hb3133.intro.html |