OR HB3132 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Veterans' Services Fund pursuant to constitutional amendment approved in Ballot Measure 96 (2016). Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Veterans' Services Fund; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |