OR HB3105 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Water Resources Department to assist with completion of place-based integrated water resources strategy, to periodically update place-based integrated water resources strategy to inform updates to state integrated water resources strategy or to facilitate implementation of place-based integrated water resources strategy. Appropriates moneys to Water Resources Department to assist with completion of place-based integrated water resources strategy, to periodically update place-based integrated water resources strategy to inform updates to state integrated water resources strategy or to facilitate implementation of place-based integrated water resources strategy. Sunsets July 1, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a place-based integrated water resources strategy; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |