OR HB3102 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Environmental Quality to purchase cyanotoxin autoanalyzer system instrument, nutrient analyzer system instrument and associated supplies and services. Directs Department of Environmental Quality to purchase cyanotoxin autoanalyzer system instrument, nutrient analyzer system instrument and associated supplies and services. Directs department to create, fill and utilize seasonal position] two positions to assist with cyanotoxin analysis. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department to purchase equipment and support increased staffing level. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to harmful algal blooms; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |