OR HB3097 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to study feasibility of establishing facility at Mt.
Title
Relating to the Department of Public Safety Standards and Training; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |