OR HB3096 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes exception allowing certain cities to impose tax or fee, in excess of standard limitation, on production, processing or sale of marijuana items. Requires distribution to county governing body, for public safety purposes, of percentage of proceeds of tax or fee imposed pursuant to exception. Applies to marijuana items produced, processed or sold on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to local taxes on marijuana items; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3096 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3096/Introduced |