OR HB3095 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority to increase fee-for-service rate for behavioral health providers participating in medical assistance programs. Directs Department of Human Services] Oregon Health Authority to increase fee-for-service rate for behavioral health providers participating in medical assistance programs. Allows Oregon Health] authority to provide matching funds to participants in federal State Loan Repayment Program as part of health care provider incentive program. Imposes certain requirements on behavioral health and addiction services providers receiving loan repayment subsidies from health care provider incentive program. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Health] authority for deposit in Health Care Provider Incentive Fund for purpose of providing loan repayment subsidies to behavioral health and addiction services providers. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care providers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |