OR HB3089 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows landowners with common boundary that is uncertain or subject to dispute to locate and fix boundary by agreement.
Title
Relating to boundary by agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Land Use. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |