OR HB3051 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 368, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 368, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits sale of gasoline by dealer unless it contains at least 10 percent denatured fuel ethanol by volume or concentrations of at least 9.2 percent anhydrous ethanol by volume. Requires Department of Transportation to study development of uniform standards for speed bump height and markings.] Sunsets January 2, 2023.] Prohibits sale of gasoline by dealer unless it contains at least 10 percent denatured fuel ethanol by volume or concentrations of at least 9.2 percent anhydrous ethanol by volume.
Title
Relating to transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 368, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Johnson, granted unanimous consent to change vote to nay. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 25--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Clem, Drazan, Gomberg, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Witt, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Grayber, Hayden. |
2021-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-05-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |