OR HB3045 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 628, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 628, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset on requirement that Oregon Health Authority reimburse cost of mental health drugs in medical assistance program. Extends sunset on requirement that Oregon Health Authority reimburse cost of mental health drugs in medical assistance program. Prohibits authority from requiring prior authorization for mental health drugs under specified conditions. Defines "mental health drug." Requires Pharmacy and Therapeutics Committee to consider recommendations of Mental Health Clinical Advisory Group in making recommendations to authority regarding mental health drugs to be included on any preferred drug list or Practitioner-Managed Prescription Drug Plan. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to mental health drugs; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] |
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 628, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Thomsen, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 3--Boquist, Robinson, Steiner Hayward; Excused, 3--Hansell, Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Dexter. |
2021-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-15 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |