OR HB3043 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that upon being sworn into office, or for other stated reasons, Governor shall file declaration with Oregon Government Ethics Commission declaring identity of First Spouse and identifying official policy-making or agenda-setting duties of First Spouse, if any. Imposes limits on official activities of First Spouse. Modifies limitations if First Spouse is declared to have official policy-making or agenda-setting duties. Requires Governor and First Spouse to file written description of duties, objectives, purposes and intended outcomes for role of First Spouse and to update description as First Spouse role changes. Requires First Spouse to request written determination of conflict of interest from commission prior to becoming First Spouse if First Spouse engages in private employment or contracts to perform services. In cases where First Spouse is to perform official policy-making or agenda-setting duties, prohibits First Spouse from engaging in private employment or performing contractual services until at least 180 days after official duties cease. Requires First Spouse to file annual statement of economic interest with commission. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Governor of the State of Oregon; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-15 | House | Motion to withdraw from Rules failed.Ayes, 28; Nays, 32--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gilliam, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, Nathanson, Nosse, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-22 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |