OR HB3043 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits school district from expending moneys received to replace school buses if school district enters into contract with private entity to provide student transportation.
Title
Relating to school transportation costs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Education. |
2013-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |