OR HB2982 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Oregon Liquor Control Commission from disciplining licensee or licensee representative for violation if violation is result of theft. Prohibits Oregon Liquor Control Commission from disciplining licensee or licensee representative for violation if violation is result of theft.
Title
Relating to marijuana.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2982 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2982/Introduced |