OR HB2959 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Health Care Services in Oregon Schools to examine scope of duties of employment and practice for licensed health care providers employed by schools, school districts or education service districts to provide health care services. Establishes Task Force on Health Care Services in Oregon Schools to examine scope of duties of employment and practice for licensed health care providers employed by schools, school districts or education service districts to provide health care services. Requires task force to examine health record systems that may be adopted by school, school district, education service district or Department of Education that would enable health care providers to maintain records of health-related information for students. Directs task force to submit report on task force's findings and recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to education no later than September 15, 2024. Sunsets task force December 31, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to health care services in schools; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |