OR HB2959 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires child's consent to parenting plan if child is 14 years of age or older. Requires child's consent to parenting plan if child is 14 years of age or older. Directs court to allow child witness in certain domestic relations proceedings to testify in person or by telephonic or electronic means.
Title
Relating to child's interests in parenting plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2959 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2959/Introduced |