OR HB2959 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Department of Revenue to calculate revenue impact attributable to federal tax expenditures in most recent biennium and to calculate percentage change in potential revenue received by General Fund compared with biennium ending June 30, 2011, with adjustment for increase attributable to inflation.
Title
Relating to federal tax expenditures; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2013-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |