OR HB2949 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 677, (2021 Laws): Effective date August 06, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 677, (2021 Laws): Effective date August 06, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide incentives to increase recruitment and retention of mental health workforce, including pipeline development, scholarships for undergraduates and stipends for graduate students, loan repayments and retention activities. Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide incentives to increase recruitment and retention of mental health workforce, including pipeline development, scholarships for undergraduates and stipends for graduate students, loan repayments and retention activities. Directs authority to expand funding, develop programs and provide incentives to improve access to culturally responsive behavioral health services by tribal members, people of color, lesbian, gay, bisexual and transgender youth, veterans, persons with disabilities, individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities, individuals with limited English proficiency, individuals working in correctional facilities, residents of rural areas and other underserved communities. Directs authority to provide funding to counties, community mental health programs and organizations to support individuals to transition from incarceration back into community.] Directs authority to provide grants to licensed practitioners to pay costs of providing supervision of mental health practitioners in private practice. Requires employers of mental health workers to pay supervision costs of workers. Requires authority to provide funding to community mental health programs and private practitioners to ensure access to mental health care by communities disproportionately challenged by COVID-19.] Appropriates moneys to authority to carry out provisions of Act. Changes name of "licensed professional counselor intern" and "licensed marriage and family therapist intern" to "licensed professional counselor associate" and "licensed marriage and family therapist associate." Declares emergency, effective on July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to mental health; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 677, (2021 Laws): Effective date August 06, 2021. |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Absent, 1--Clem; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |