OR HB2946 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 667, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 667, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Chief Information Officer to include links to websites established by certain entities on Oregon transparency website.
Title
Relating to the Oregon transparency website.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Sen. Richard Devlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the bill. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the bill. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 667, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Gorsek. |
2017-06-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-02-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |