OR HB2929 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 238, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 238, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies police officer's duty to report misconduct. Modifies police officer's duty to report misconduct. Requires police officers to report violation of certain minimum standards. Requires law enforcement unit to investigate reports of misconduct and violation of standards. Directs Bureau of Labor and Industries to establish and maintain form and database for reports of misconduct and to investigate certain reports of misconduct.] Directs Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to establish and maintain form for reports of misconduct or violation of standards and to forward reports of misconduct or violation of standards to law enforcement units.
Title
Relating to police officer misconduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 238, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Findley, Girod; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Bynum, Noble. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Leif, Nearman. |
2021-04-20 | House | Carried over to April 26, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Equitable Policing. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |