OR HB2924 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Chapter 123, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Chapter 123, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to brewery licensees.
Title
Relating to brewery licensees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Chapter 123, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-05-19 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-16 | President signed. | |
2011-05-13 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-10 | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-05-09 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-09 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-05-03 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-06 | Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2011-04-05 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-04 | Third reading. Carried by Matthews. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-03-31 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-29 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-03-24 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-10 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to General Government and Consumer Protection. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |