OR HB2895 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes program within Housing and Community Services Department to provide grants for decommissioning and disposing of manufactured dwellings. Appropriates moneys to department from General Fund for grant program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to manufactured dwellings; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |