OR HB2877 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides funding for instruction for talented and gifted children based on amount per student.
Title
Relating to funding for talented and gifted children; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-07-02 | House | Motion to withdraw from Revenue failed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 33--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Dembrow, Doherty, Frederick, Gallegos, Garrett, Gelser, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lively, Matthews, McKeown, Nathanson, Read, Reardon, Tomei, Unger, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 2--Fagan, Weidner. |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-03-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference, then be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue, then Ways and Means. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |